MD SB1067 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Task Force on Solar Hot Water Systems in Prince George's County; providing for the members of the Task Force; providing for the designation of a chair of the Task Force; requiring the Prince George's County government to provide staff for the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation; providing that a member of the Task Force may receive reimbursement of specified expenses; etc.
Title
Task Force on Solar Hot Water Systems in Prince George's County
Sponsors
Sen. Ulysses Currie [D] | Sen. Nathaniel Exum [D] | Sen. David Harrington [D] | Sen. Thomas Miller [D] |
Sen. Anthony Muse [D] | Sen. Douglas Peters [D] | Sen. Jim Rosapepe [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-03 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2010-04-02 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-03-31 | Hearing 4/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-23 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2010-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | |
2010-03-25 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | |
2010-03-10 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-05 | Re-referred Finance | |
2010-03-01 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Alternative Energy Sources
Committees and Commissions
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Heating and Cooling
Prince George`s County
Reports
Sunset
Water
Alternative Energy Sources
Committees and Commissions
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Heating and Cooling
Prince George`s County
Reports
Sunset
Water