MD SB1060 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-4)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a county board of education to consult with the county superintendent of schools before any change in the hiring or termination of personnel in connection with a school health services program; requiring the drug addiction and prevention program implemented in the public schools to include instruction on heroin and opioid addiction and prevention, including information on the lethal effects of fentanyl; prohibiting specified personnel from being held personally liable under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Heroin and Opioid Education and Community Action Act of 2017 (Start Talking Maryland Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 574 |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2017-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0) |
2017-04-08 | House | Floor Amendment {673221/1 (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {766683/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-04-06 | House | Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-04-04 | House | Rereferred to Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-28 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {254839/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2017-02-13 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Administrative Office of the Courts
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Drugs
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Forms
Good Samaritan
Grants
Health Occupations
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Law Enforcement
Nurses
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Substance Abuse
Appropriations
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Drugs
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Forms
Good Samaritan
Grants
Health Occupations
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Law Enforcement
Nurses
Primary and Secondary Education
Reports
State Universities and Colleges
Substance Abuse