MD SB106 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Removing a reference to a specified public transportation provider in Carroll County from the definition of "local government" under the Local Government Tort Claims Act.
Title
Carroll County - Local Government Tort Claims Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-2) (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-2) (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 45 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-03-24 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2017-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-23 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-23 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2017-03-22 | House | Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-17 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-2) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-13 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Carroll County
Civil Actions and Procedures
Counties - Local Laws
Mass Transit
Nonprofit Organizations
Torts
Civil Actions and Procedures
Counties - Local Laws
Mass Transit
Nonprofit Organizations
Torts