MD SB106 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a credit against the State income tax for qualified employers employing specified individuals in qualified positions; providing for certification by the Secretary of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation of qualified employers eligible for the credit and the maximum credit for which a qualified employer is eligible; limiting the credit to $250,000 for each qualified employer; limiting the aggregate credit that may be approved by the Secretary to $20,000,000, to be allocated on a first-come, first-served basis; etc.
Title
Labor and Employment - Job Creation and Recovery Tax Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-25 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Mooney) {393625/1 Rejected (Y: 6 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2010-02-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Mooney) {393625/1 Rejected (Y: 6 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-03-22 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-6) | |
2010-03-22 | Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Hixson) Adopted (133-3) | |
2010-03-22 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-03-22 | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-01 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2010-03-25 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2010-03-25 | Senate Concur - House Amendments | |
2010-02-26 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-02-24 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-24 | Floor Amendment (Senator Stone) Adopted | |
2010-02-24 | Floor Amendment (Senator Mooney) Rejected (6-40) | |
2010-02-24 | Laid Over later today Adopted | |
2010-02-24 | Floor Amendment (Senator Mooney) | |
2010-02-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-02-23 | Laid Over (Senator Currie) Adopted | |
2010-02-23 | Favorable with Amendments | |
2010-02-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2010-01-26 | Hearing 2/2 at 1:30 p.m. | |
2010-01-26 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-21 | Hearing 2/2 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-21 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-20 | Hearing 1/27 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-14 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Business and Economic Development, Department of
Comptroller
Disclosure
Income Tax
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Privacy
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Unemployment
Work, Labor and Employment
Comptroller
Disclosure
Income Tax
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Privacy
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Unemployment
Work, Labor and Employment