MD SB1059 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expressly requiring the Comptroller to enforce provisions of law applicable to specified activities conducted by a department of liquor control or a liquor control board; and making specified powers of liquor control boards subject to the enforcement authority of the Comptroller.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Comptroller - Departments of Liquor Control and Liquor
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-06 | Third Reading Passed (135-1) | |
2012-04-03 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-04-03 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-07 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-04-04 | Re-referred Economic Matters | |
2012-03-29 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2012-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-26 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-26 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-30 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-19 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-09 | Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-29 | First Reading Senate Rules |