MD SB1054 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 576
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 576
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of qualifying residing artist for an arts and entertainment district to include individuals who own or rent residential real property in the State and who conduct business and derive income in specified areas; altering the eligibility for specified individuals to claim specified tax incentives; etc.
Title
Economic Development - Arts and Entertainment Districts - Qualifying Residing Artists
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (125-13) (Y: 125 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 576 |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2014-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-13) |
2014-04-01 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2014-03-25 | House | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2014-02-19 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Admissions and Amusement Tax
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Exemptions
Income Tax
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Art, Music and Cultural Affairs
Exemptions
Income Tax
Property Tax
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income