MD SB1041 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Office of Health Care Quality to establish, by December 31, 2020, a training program and a skills review and check for nurses who care for medically fragile individuals in the homes of the medically fragile individuals; authorizing the Office to contract or coordinate with a third party to meet certain requirements; requiring, beginning January 1, 2021, a nurse who provides care to a medically fragile individual to complete a certain training program before beginning to provide care except under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Health - Care of Medically Fragile Individuals (Channing's Law)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-08SenateRereferred to Finance
2019-03-04SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback