MD SB104 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-05 - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a fee of $14 to be collected once every 2 years on each motor vehicle registered in the State that is granted a waiver from, exempted from, or not subject to the Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program; and requiring the fee to be deposited in the Maryland Strategic Energy Investment Fund and be used to incentivize and purchase electric vehicles and expand electric vehicle infrastructure.
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Not Subject to Inspection - Fee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-05 | Senate | Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-12 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2021-11-01 | Senate | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB46 (Crossfiled) 2022-01-10 - Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Exemptions
Fees
Motor Vehicle Inspection
Motor Vehicles
Pollution
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Fees
Motor Vehicle Inspection
Motor Vehicles
Pollution
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 9 | 20B-05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 13 | 616 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 23 | 202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 23 | 205.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 23 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 23 | 206.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Transportation | 23 | 206.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0104?ys=2022RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2022RS/bills/sb/sb0104f.pdf |