MD SB1038 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a court, when sentencing a minor convicted as an adult, to impose a sentence less than the minimum term required by law; prohibiting a court from imposing a sentence of life without the possibility of parole or release for a minor; authorizing a certain individual to file a motion to reduce the duration of the individual's sentence; requiring the court to conduct a hearing on a motion to reduce the duration of a sentence; etc.
Title
Juveniles Convicted as Adults - Sentencing - Limitations and Reduction (Juvenile Restoration Act)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB1437 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-10 - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Education
Electronic Communication
Evidence
Health
Hearings
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Mental and Behavioral Health
Penalties and Sentences
Time
Victims
Video
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedure
Education
Electronic Communication
Evidence
Health
Hearings
Juvenile Causes
Juvenile Law
Mental and Behavioral Health
Penalties and Sentences
Time
Victims
Video
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 6 | 235 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 8 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB1038?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb1038f.pdf |