MD SB1036 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Approving specified projects for the acquisition, development, and improvement of specified academic facilities for the University System of Maryland; authorizing the University System of Maryland to issue bonds in a total principal amount of $17,000,000 to finance specified projects; etc.
Title
Academic Facilities Bonding Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 105 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-23 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Third Reading Passed (105-29) | |
2012-03-28 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-28 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | |
2012-03-30 | Re-referred Appropriations | |
2012-03-25 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2012-03-29 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-23 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-03-22 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-22 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-26 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2012-03-12 | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-12 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-29 | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | Re-referred Budget and Taxation | |
2012-02-23 | First Reading Senate Rules |