MD SB1033 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-01 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-01 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adding and modifying an exception to the requirement that specified students attend a public school regularly during the entire school year; requiring the State Department of Education to adopt standards for the suspension or expulsion of a student under a provision of law and the readmission of a student to a specified school; requiring county boards of education and the Board of School Commissioners of Baltimore City to establish alternative schooling for specified students under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Public Education - Alternative Schooling
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-28 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Counties
Discipline
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Local Government Mandates
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Employees
Public Schools
Students
Counties
Discipline
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Local Government Mandates
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Employees
Public Schools
Students