MD SB1032 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Altering from 30 to 60 megawatts the capacity of certain hydroelectric power plants in the definition of a Tier 1 renewable source for the renewable energy portfolio standard; and extending the renewable energy portfolio standard percentage derived from Tier 2 renewable sources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Hydroelectric Power

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-15SenateHearing canceled
2020-03-15SenateHearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
2020-03-15SenateHearing canceled
2020-03-15SenateHearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-15SenateHearing canceled
2020-03-09SenateHearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-03-02SenateRereferred to Finance
2020-02-17SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities7701(n/a)See Bill Text
Public Utilities7703(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback