MD SB1030 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-29 - Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Education to develop curriculum content for a course in financial literacy; requiring county boards of education to implement financial literacy curriculum content in public high schools in the county; requiring students to complete a financial literacy course in order to graduate from high school; etc.
Title
State Board of Education - Financial Literacy Curriculum - Graduation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-29 | Unfavorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs Withdrawn | |
2010-03-02 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-01 | Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-02-25 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Consumer Protection
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Local Government Mandates
Public Schools
Students
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Local Government Mandates
Public Schools
Students
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/SB1030.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/sb/sb1030f.pdf |