MD SB103 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 140
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting health occupations boards and disciplinary panels from reprimanding a licensee or certificate holder, placing a licensee or certificate holder on probation, or suspending or revoking a license of a licensee or the certificate of a certificate holder solely on the basis of a licensee's or certificate holder's use of a diagnostic evaluation or treatment that is integrative, complementary, alternative, or nonconventional, including in the treatment of Lyme disease or tick-borne illnesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Occupations - Diagnostic Evaluation and Treatment of Patients - Disciplinary Actions (The Patient's Access to Integrative Healthcare Act of 2020)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08SenateEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 140
2020-03-17SenatePassed Enrolled
2020-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2020-03-17SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (131-0)
2020-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {986284/1 Adopted
2020-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2020-03-02HouseReferred Health and Government Operations
2020-02-28SenateThird Reading Passed (43-0)
2020-02-26SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-02-26SenateFavorable with Amendments {954531/1 Adopted
2020-02-25SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-01-08SenateHearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
2020-01-08SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-10-21SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB259 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 139

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health Occupations1604(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback