MD HB259 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 139
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 139
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting health occupations boards and disciplinary panels from reprimanding a licensee or certificate holder, placing a licensee or certificate holder on probation, or suspending or revoking a license of a licensee or the certificate of a certificate holder solely on the basis of a licensee's or certificate holder's use of a diagnostic evaluation or treatment that is integrative, complementary, alternative, or nonconventional, including in the treatment of Lyme disease or tick-borne illnesses.
Title
Health Occupations - Diagnostic Evaluation and Treatment of Patients - Disciplinary Actions (The Patient's Access to Integrative Healthcare Act of 2020)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 139 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2020-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {456086/1 Adopted |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-20 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB103 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 140
Subjects
Certifications
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Consumer Protection
Discipline
Ethics
Examinations
Health Occupations
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Notices
Patients
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Safety
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Consumer Protection
Discipline
Ethics
Examinations
Health Occupations
License Commissioners, Boards of
Licenses
Medical Treatments
Notices
Patients
Penalties and Sentences
Public Health
Safety
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health Occupations | 1 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |