MD SB1029 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland Agricultural Certainty Program; stating the intent of the General Assembly; establishing the purpose of the Program; requiring the Department of Agriculture to develop the Program in coordination with the Department of the Environment; requiring that the Program be self-sustaining and revenue neutral; requiring the Department of Agriculture to administer the Program; authorizing the Department of Agriculture to establish by regulation reasonable fees to cover operation of the Program; etc.
Title
Maryland Agricultural Certainty Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (37-10) (Y: 37 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (105-27) (Y: 105 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-31 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Frick) {373829/2 Rejected (15-112) (Y: 15 N: 112 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-03-31 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Mizeur) {793725/1 Rejected (17-115) (Y: 17 N: 115 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (38-9) (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order until 3/25 (Forehand) Rejected (12-33) (Y: 12 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (105-27) (Y: 105 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-31 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Frick) {373829/2 Rejected (15-112) (Y: 15 N: 112 NV: 12 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-03-31 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Mizeur) {793725/1 Rejected (17-115) (Y: 17 N: 115 NV: 7 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2013-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (38-9) (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order until 3/25 (Forehand) Rejected (12-33) (Y: 12 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (37-10) |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Senate Concur - House Amendments |
2013-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (105-27) |
2013-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-05 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Frick) {373829/2 Rejected (15-112) |
2013-04-05 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Cardin) {143726/1 Rejected |
2013-04-05 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Mizeur) {793725/1 Rejected (17-115) |
2013-04-05 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Mizeur) {413521/1 Rejected |
2013-04-05 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate Mizeur) Adopted |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {840917/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-04-02 | House | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-27 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-04-03 | House | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-26 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (38-9) |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Glassman) {123622/1 Adopted |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Middleton) {313422/1 Adopted |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 3/25 (Senator Forehand) Rejected (12-33) |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {384732/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Raskin) Adopted |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {384732/1 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2013-02-26 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Counties
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Health
Farmland
Fees
Inspections
Job Training
Licenses
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Pollution
Privacy
Public Information
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sediment Control
Sewage
Water
Agriculture, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Contracts
Counties
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Environment
Environment, Department of
Environmental Health
Farmland
Fees
Inspections
Job Training
Licenses
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Pollution
Privacy
Public Information
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sediment Control
Sewage
Water