MD SB1025 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-15 - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a definition of "disseminate" to exclude providing information to victims of crime or their representatives; altering the purposes of specified provisions of law relating to the Criminal Justice Information System; and requiring the Department of Information Technology to conduct a specified study relating to interfaces used for automated victim notification and to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2017.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Notification - Dissemination and National Standards
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |