MD SB1020 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a unit to give a certain preference under certain circumstances to a certain resident firm that is licensed or otherwise authorized to provide architectural services or engineering services in the State; requiring a certain nonresident firm to submit certain documentation concerning certain preferences to a unit at the request of the unit; requiring a unit to apply certain preferences to certain proposals in a certain manner; etc.
Title
Procurement - Architectural Services and Engineering Services - Reciprocal Preference
Sponsors
Sen. Joan Conway [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | Senate | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 634 |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-29 | House | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
Subjects
Architects
Engineers
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Residency
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Procurement
Engineers
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Residency
Rules and Regulations
State Government - Procurement