MD SB102 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring an automobile insurance policy issued, sold, or delivered in the State to be construed to make the insurer directly liable, within the terms and limits of the policy, to certain third-party claimants; providing that a third-party claimant has a right of direct action against a certain insurer subject to certain requirements; authorizing a third-party claimant to bring an action against an insurer alone if the third-party claimant agrees to cap recovery at applicable policy limits; applying the Act prospectively; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Courts – Direct Action Against Automobile Insurer

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-15 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (30-16) (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor - Favorable with Amendments Adopted (32-14) (Y: 33 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15HouseHearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
2019-03-15HouseFirst Reading Judiciary and Economic Matters
2019-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed (30-16)
2019-03-13SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-13SenateFavorable with Amendments Report Adopted (32-14)
2019-03-08SenateSpecial Order until 3/13 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
2019-03-08SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
2019-03-08SenateFavorable with Amendments
2019-03-07SenateMotion Special Order until 3/8 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
2019-03-07SenateFavorable with Amendments
2019-03-06SenateSpecial Order until 3/7 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
2019-03-06SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-03-06SenateFavorable with Amendments {528173/1
2019-03-05SenateLaid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted
2019-03-05SenateFavorable with Amendments {528173/1
2019-03-04SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-01-16SenateHearing 1/30 at 2:00 p.m.
2019-01-16SenateHearing canceled
2019-01-15SenateHearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-14SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback