MD SB1017 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a pharmacy benefits manager to maintain an adequate and accessible pharmacy benefits manager network consisting of contracted pharmacies that provide convenient patient access to pharmacy services; authorizing the Maryland Insurance Commissioner to adopt certain regulations; prohibiting a pharmacy benefits manager from requiring a certain pharmacy or pharmacist to obtain certain accreditation, certification, or credentialing as a condition for participating in a certain network; etc.
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Network Adequacy and Reimbursement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m. |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2020-02-12 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Same As/Similar To
HB1307 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 455
Subjects
Beneficiaries
Boundaries
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Communications
Contracts
Drugs
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Communication
Fees
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
Liability
Licenses
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Prices
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Boundaries
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Communications
Contracts
Drugs
Electronic Commerce
Electronic Communication
Fees
Health Insurance
Health Occupations
Insurance - Health
Insurance Administration
Liability
Licenses
Patients
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Prices
Reimbursement Rates
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Insurance | 15 | 1611.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 1628 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 1628.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Insurance | 15 | 1628.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB1017?ys=2020RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2020RS/bills/sb/sb1017f.pdf |