MD SB1017 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering a certain definition of "serious offense" to remove a certain limitation on offenses that are included for purposes relating to representation by the Office of the Public Defender.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal Procedure - Office of the Public Defender - Definition of Serious Offense

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (42-0) (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2019-03-29SenateThird Reading Passed (42-0)
2019-03-28SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-28SenateFavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-12SenateHearing 3/21 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-08SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2019-02-28SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback