MD SB1017 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-29 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-29 - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering from July 1, 2012, to July 1, 2013, the date on or after which a person is prohibited from manufacturing, selling, offering for sale, or distributing in the State specified children's jewelry that contains a specified amount of cadmium.
Title
Environment - Cadmium in Children's Jewelry - Prohibition
Sponsors
Sen. Roy Dyson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-29 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | Re-referred Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-02-20 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/SB1017.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/sb/sb1017f.pdf |