MD SB1015 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the types of elements and units for which a council of unit owners is required to maintain certain property insurance; requiring the council of unit owners to notify owners of detached units within a condominium of certain property insurance coverage obligations; limiting instances when an owner of a detached unit within a condominium is required to carry homeowners insurance on the entirety of the unit; and authorizing a council of unit owners to carry homeowners insurance on the entirety of units with a condominium.
Title
Condominiums – Mandatory Insurance Coverage – Detached Units
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (38-0) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {703828/1 Adopted |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Same As/Similar To
HB1227 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 11 | 114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |