MD HB1227 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the types of elements and units for which a council of unit owners is required to maintain certain property insurance; requiring the council of unit owners to annually notify, in writing, owners of detached units of certain property insurance obligations; limiting instances when an owner of a detached unit within a condominium is required to carry homeowners insurance on the entirety of the unit; and authorizing a council of unit owners to carry homeowners insurance on the entirety of all units located within a certain condominium.
Title
Condominiums - Mandatory Insurance Coverage - Detached Units
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296 |
2024-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2024-04-08 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {503425/1 Adopted |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2024-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2024-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {923623/1 Adopted |
2024-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-09 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB1015 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 11 | 114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |