MD SB1013 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Hearing 3/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Hearing 3/21 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Task Force on Volunteer Fire Companies and Rescue Squads to review certain staffing levels and recruitment practices, evaluate the cost of training and technology, and evaluate the differences in needs of rural, suburban, and volunteer fire companies and rescue squads; requiring the Task Force to study and report its recommendations regarding staffing shortages for volunteer fire companies and rescue squads to the Governor and General Assembly by December 31, 2019; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Task Force on Volunteer Fire Companies and Rescue Squads
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-27 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Fire Protection
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Rescue Squads
Sunset
Volunteers
Work, Labor and Employment
Fire Protection
Industry and Technology
Job Training
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Reports
Rescue Squads
Sunset
Volunteers
Work, Labor and Employment