MD SB1011 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-02 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-04-02 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the length of time a school bus may be operated in Cecil County from 12 years to 15 years.
Title
Cecil County - School Buses - Length of Operation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (43-0) (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Hearing 3/01 at 11:00 a.m. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |