MD SB101 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the operator of a vending machine that contains a food that contains peanuts to post a warning label on the exterior of the vending machine that informs consumers that some foods contained within the vending machine may contain peanuts; etc.
Title
Public Health - Peanut Warning - Vending Machines
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-10 | Unfavorable Report by Finance | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing 2/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-27 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-22 | Hearing 2/4 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-14 | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/SB0101.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/sb/sb0101f.pdf |