MD SB1009 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 707
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 707
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Making a contractor under a public work contract that knew or reasonably should have known of the contractor's obligation to pay the prevailing wage rate and that deliberately failed or refused to pay to the prevailing wage rate liable to the public body for liquidated damages of $250 for each laborer or other employee under specified circumstances.
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Liquidated Damages
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Roger Manno [D] | Sen. Delores Kelley [D] | Sen. Thomas Middleton [D] |
Sen. Catherine Pugh [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-05 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (95-46) (Y: 95 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-14) (Y: 32 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-28 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 707 |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2016-04-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (95-46) |
2016-04-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-08 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2016-04-06 | House | Rereferred to Economic Matters |
2016-04-05 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (32-14) |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {567879/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Laid Over (Senator Ready) Adopted |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {567879/1 |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2016-02-15 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Contractors
Contracts
Damages
Liability
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Procurement
Public Works
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Work, Labor and Employment
Contractors
Contracts
Damages
Liability
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Procurement
Public Works
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
Work, Labor and Employment