MD SB1007 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-20 - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an insurer that issues or delivers in the State a policy of motor vehicle liability insurance that provides coverage for the repair of physical damage to the insured motor vehicle to authorize specified repairs to be made using original equipment manufacturer's replacement crash parts or certified aftermarket crash parts; authorizing an insured to consent in a specified manner to the use of aftermarket crash parts; etc.
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Replacement Parts for Damaged Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-20 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Automotive Repair
Insurance - Other than Health
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Service Stations
Automotive Repair
Insurance - Other than Health
Motor Vehicle Equipment
Motor Vehicle Insurance
Service Stations