MD SB1006 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a retail service station dealer in Baltimore City to post a specified sign in a conspicuous location at the retail service station that states specified prohibitions relating to dispensing motor fuel into a dirt bike; prohibiting a specified person, in Baltimore City, from dispensing motor fuel into a dirt bike from a retail pump at a service station; establishing penalties; etc.
Title
Baltimore City - Sale of Motor Fuel for Dirt Bikes - Prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (135-5) | |
2010-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-04-01 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-26 | First Reading Economic Matters | |
2010-04-05 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-28 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-03-26 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-03-26 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-03-29 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2010-03-19 | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-18 | Re-referred Finance | |
2010-02-24 | First Reading Senate Rules |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Comptroller
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Drivers` Licenses
Fines
Fuel
Hearings
Minors
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motorcycles and Motor Scooters
Notices
Off-Road Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Service Stations
Signs and Billboards
Comptroller
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Drivers` Licenses
Fines
Fuel
Hearings
Minors
Motor Vehicle Administration
Motorcycles and Motor Scooters
Notices
Off-Road Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Service Stations
Signs and Billboards