MD SB1005 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Division of Parole and Probation to conduct a risk and needs assessment on inmates as soon as feasible after sentencing and develop a case plan to guide an inmate's rehabilitation while in custody; altering the manner in which specified diminution credits may be earned; authorizing expungement for convictions for specified misdemeanors after 10 years, or 15 years under specified conditions; establishing the Justice Reinvestment Oversight Board and the Local Government Justice Reinvestment Commission; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Justice Reinvestment Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-06 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (123-18) (Y: 123 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion suspend the rules (President) Adopted (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - House - House Floor - (Frick) Adopted (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (106-31) (Y: 106 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House Floor - Motion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Dumais) Adopted (111-26) (Y: 111 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Simonaire) {193324/1 Rejected (1-42) (Y: 1 N: 42 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2016-03-19 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Simonaire) {723125/1 Rejected (1-43) (Y: 1 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-05-19SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 515
2016-04-11SenatePassed Enrolled
2016-04-11HouseThird Reading Passed (123-18)
2016-04-11HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2016-04-11SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2016-04-11SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2016-04-07HouseDelegates Dumais, Hammen, Barron, Vallario, and West
2016-04-07HouseConference Committee Appointed
2016-04-07HouseHouse Refuses to Recede
2016-04-07HouseMotion suspend the rules (Delegate Frick) Adopted (138-0)
2016-04-07SenateSenators Zirkin, McFadden, Hough, Peters, and DeGrange
2016-04-07SenateConference Committee Appointed
2016-04-07SenateSenate Requests House Recede
2016-04-07SenateSenate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
2016-04-07SenateMotion suspend the rules (President) Adopted (44-0)
2016-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed with Amendments (106-31)
2016-04-06HouseMotion Rules Suspended two readings same day (Delegate Dumais) Adopted (111-26)
2016-04-06HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments {152714/1 Report Adopted
2016-04-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2016-04-07HouseHearing cancelled (Health and Government Operations)
2016-04-07HouseHearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
2016-04-05HouseRereferred to Judiciary and Health and Government Operations
2016-04-05HouseHearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
2016-04-04HouseRereferred to Judiciary
2016-03-25HouseFirst Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
2016-03-24SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2016-03-23SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-03-21SenateSpecial Order until 3/23 (Senator Benson) Adopted
2016-03-21SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {193324/1 Rejected (1-42)
2016-03-21SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {723125/1 Rejected (1-43)
2016-03-21SenateFloor Amendment (Senator Hough) {243728/1 Adopted
2016-03-21SenateFavorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2016-03-21SenateCommittee Amendment Adopted
2016-03-21SenateFavorable with Amendments {508476/1
2016-03-21SenateSpecial Order until later today (Senator Madaleno) Adopted
2016-03-21SenateFavorable with Amendments {508476/1
2016-03-18SenateLaid Over (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
2016-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments {508476/1
2016-03-18SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2016-03-02SenateHearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-18SenateRereferred to Judicial Proceedings
2016-02-15SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects

Administrative Office of the Courts
Appropriations
Assessments
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Correction, Division of
Correctional Institutions
Counties
Courts
Crime Control and Prevention, Governor's Office of
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Injuries Compensation
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Death
Disabilities
Disclosure
Diseases
Domestic Violence
Drivers' Licenses
Drunk and Drugged Driving
Equipment
Executive Orders
Expungement
Extortion
Fees
Fines
Forgery
Fraud
Gangs
Governor
Grants
Harassment
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Hearings
Identification
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Judges
Jurisdiction
Legislation
Licenses
Mediation
Mental Health
Minors
Notices
Parole and Probation
Penalties and Sentences
Pretrial Detention or Release
Prisoners
Process Serving
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Reimbursement Rates
Reports
Restitution
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Search and Seizure
Sexual Offenses
Smoking
State's Attorneys
Substance Abuse
Summonses
Support of Dependents
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Theft
Victims
Violence
Work, Labor and Employment

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB1005?ys=2016rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/sb/sb1005f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/sb/sb1005t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/sb/sb1005e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/Chapters_noln/CH_515_sb1005e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0005/sb1005_50847601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0005/sb1005_19332401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0005/sb1005_24372801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0005/sb1005_72312501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0005/sb1005_15271401.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0005/sb1005_13382501.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0005/sb1005_45362601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/fnotes/bil_0005/sb1005.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/sb1005_jpr.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/sb1005_hgo.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/sb1005_jud.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/amds/bil_0005/sb1005_45362601.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/ag_letters/sb1005.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb1005,s-0702&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb1005,s-0703&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb1005,s-0735&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb1005,h-1020&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb1005,h-1021&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb1005,h-1104&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb1005,s-1114&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb1005,s-1308&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=sb1005,h-1354&stab=02&ys=2016RS

Bill Comments

feedback