MD SB1004 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-10 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that specified provisions of State law governing performance standards for vehicle dealers apply to vehicle manufacturers notwithstanding specified other agreements; requiring that the assignment of a dealer's market area meet specified standards; and requiring vehicle manufacturers to consider specified factors in assigning a market area and applying performance standards, sales objectives, or programs for measuring dealer performance.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Dealers - Performance Standards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-10 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Floor Amendment {753322/1 (Senator Klausmeier) Rejected |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Floor Amendment {133129/1 (Senator Klausmeier) Rejected |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {138774/1 Report Adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Special Order until 4/10 (Senator Miller) Adopted |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {138774/1 |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Consumer Protection
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicles
Unfair Trade Practices
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Motor Vehicle Dealers and Salesmen
Motor Vehicles
Unfair Trade Practices
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration