MD SB1001 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-04 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to require that a course of instruction in boating safety education include certain information relating to carbon monoxide poisoning; requiring the Department to adopt regulations requiring certain warning labels to be affixed to certain used vessels sold within the State; prohibiting a dealer from selling a certain used vessel in the State unless the dealer ensures that a certain warning label has been affixed to the vessel in accordance with certain regulations; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Natural Resources - State Boat Act - Carbon Monoxide Safety (Matthew's Law)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-04SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18SenateHearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14SenateRereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-21SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback