MD SB1 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB1043

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-7)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 42
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to establish a new unit to assist in evaluating and reviewing certain proposals for new programs and substantial modifications of existing programs; requiring the Governor, for fiscal years 2023 through 2032, to include in the annual State operating budget $577,000,000 to be allocated to certain historically black colleges and universities; establishing the Historically Black Colleges and Universities Reserve Fund; requiring the Cigarette Restitution Fund to include a separate account; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24SenateApproved by the Governor - Chapter 42
2021-03-17SenatePassed Enrolled
2021-03-17SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-03-17SenateSenate Concurs House Amendments
2021-03-10HouseThird Reading Passed (122-17)
2021-03-09HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments {814960/1 Adopted
2021-03-09HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2021-03-02HouseHearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
2021-02-08HouseReferred Appropriations
2021-02-05SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-02-03SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-02-03SenateFavorable with Amendments {519531/1 Adopted
2021-02-03SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
2021-01-18SenateHearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m. (Budget and Taxation)
2021-01-18SenateHearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
2021-01-12SenateHearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
2021-01-12SenateHearing canceled (Budget and Taxation)
2021-01-04SenateHearing 1/20 at 11:00 a.m. (Budget and Taxation)
2021-01-13SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation and Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2020-11-01SenatePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

HB1 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 41
SB1043 (Carry Over) 2020-02-27 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education10214(n/a)See Bill Text
Education11206.3(n/a)See Bill Text
Education15126(n/a)See Bill Text
Education15127(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement6226(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement7317(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/SB0001?ys=2021RS
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0001f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0001t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/sb/sb0001e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/Chapters_noln/CH_42_sb0001e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0001_51953101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2021RS/amds/bil_0001/sb0001_81496001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0001_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes_comm/sb0001_app.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0146.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/House/0330.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/votes/Senate/0481.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback