MD HB1 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-16 - Referred Budget and Taxation Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to establish a certain new unit to assist in evaluating and reviewing certain proposals for new programs and substantial modifications of existing programs; requiring the Governor, in each of fiscal years 2023 through 2032, to include in the annual State operating budget $577,000,000 to be allocated to certain historically black colleges and universities; establishing the Historically Black Colleges and Universities Reserve Fund; specifying the purpose and uses of the Fund; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Funding

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 115 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16SenateReferred Budget and Taxation Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2021-02-12HouseThird Reading Passed (115-14)
2021-02-11HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-02-05HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2021-01-04HouseHearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-01-13HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2020-10-16HousePre-filed

Same As/Similar To

SB1 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-09 - Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education10214(n/a)See Bill Text
Education11206.3(n/a)See Bill Text
Education15126(n/a)See Bill Text
Education15127(n/a)See Bill Text
State Finance and Procurement6226(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback