MD HJ9 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing the hour from 8:30 p.m to 9:30 p.m. on March 27, 2010, as Earth Hour; urging Marylanders to observe Earth Hour; and urging the Governor to order that the lights in the Government House and the State Capitol complex be turned off during Earth Hour.
Title
Earth Hour
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2010-03-03 | Hearing 3/8 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-17 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Subjects
Conservation
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Holidays and Special Dates
Public Buildings and Facilities
State House
Energy Matters
Environmental Matters
Holidays and Special Dates
Public Buildings and Facilities
State House
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HJ0009.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hj/hj0009f.pdf |