MD HB994 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting employers who employ 15 or more full-time employees from requiring an applicant for employment, before the first in-person interview, to disclose certain information regarding the criminal record of the applicant except under certain circumstances; authorizing the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to conduct an investigation to determine whether the Act has been violated on receipt of a written complaint of an applicant or employee; authorizing the Commissioner to assess a certain civil penalty; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor and Employment - Criminal Record Screening Practices (Ban the Box)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-40) (Y: 97 N: 40 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (30-14) (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (30-15) (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (96-37) (Y: 97 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-08SenateThird Reading Passed (30-14)
2019-04-08SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-08HouseThird Reading Passed (97-40)
2019-04-08HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2019-04-05SenateSenators Augustine, Hayes, and Benson
2019-04-05SenateConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-05SenateSenate Refuses to Recede
2019-04-03HouseDelegates Wilson, Crosby, and C. Watson
2019-04-03HouseConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-03HouseHouse Requests Senate Recede
2019-04-03HouseHouse Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (30-15)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {747070/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-03-16HouseThird Reading Passed (96-37)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {333791/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-08HouseHearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0994&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0994f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0994t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0994e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0994_33379101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0994_74707001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0994_70352601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0994_54352901.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0004/hb0994.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0994_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0597.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0994_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1025.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0994_54352901.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1331.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1510.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback