MD HB990 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming the Maryland Emergency Management Agency to be the Maryland Department of Emergency Management; establishing the Department as a principal department of the Executive Branch of State government; providing that the head of the Department is the Secretary of Emergency Management; requiring the Secretary to be appointed by the Governor with the advice and consent of the Senate; transferring the Maryland 9-1-1 Board from the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to the Department; etc.
Title
Maryland Department of Emergency Management – Establishment and Transfer of Maryland 9–1–1 Board
Sponsors
Del. Susan Krebs [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287 |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2021-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {826681/1 Adopted |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-02-12 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB658 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 288
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Annotated Code of Maryland
Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Emergency Services
Forms
General Assembly
Governor
Legislative Services, Department of
Liability
Names
Printing
Public Officials
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Publications
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
State Documents
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor, and Employment
Annotated Code of Maryland
Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Emergency Services
Forms
General Assembly
Governor
Legislative Services, Department of
Liability
Names
Printing
Public Officials
Public Safety
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Publications
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Safety
Salaries and Compensation
State Documents
State Employees
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Environment | 5 | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
General Provisions | 4 | 314.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 17 | 602 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 17 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 9 | 232 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 3 | 1005 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Natural Resources | 3 | 1015 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 1 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 1 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 13 | 501 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 101.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 107 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 112 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 115 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 116 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 603 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 14 | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 8 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 8 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 8 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 8 | 104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 8 | 105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Safety | 8 | 106 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 10 | 1503 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 8 | 201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 2901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |