MD HB987 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain students who are at least 18 years old and under the age of 21 years to taste certain alcoholic beverages while participating in a course or program in enology, fermenting, brewing, or hospitality and tourism offered by a qualified institution of higher education without criminal penalty to the student, instructor, or institution of higher education under certain circumstances.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages – Use of Alcoholic Beverages for Educational Purposes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-11 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 63 |
2023-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2023-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2023-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2023-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2023-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-02-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB672 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 62
Subjects
Age
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Curriculum
Education
Higher Education
Students
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Curriculum
Education
Higher Education
Students
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 1 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 1 | 411 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 10 | 114 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 10 | 116 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Law | 10 | 117 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |