MD HB986 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Department of Health to study the impact of requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program to provide comprehensive coverage for the treatment of obesity, including coverage for intensive behavioral therapy, bariatric surgery, and FDA-approved antiobesity medication; and requiring the Department to report its findings and recommendations to certain committees of the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2024.
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Coverage for the Treatment of Obesity - Required Study
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2024-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-4) |
2024-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {153322/1 Adopted |
2024-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2024-02-09 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB594 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-05 - Passed Enrolled
Subjects
Drugs
Federal Government
Health
Health Insurance
Health, Department of
Medical Assistance
Medical Conditions
Medical Treatments
Notices
Public Health
Reports
studies
Federal Government
Health
Health Insurance
Health, Department of
Medical Assistance
Medical Conditions
Medical Treatments
Notices
Public Health
Reports
studies
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 15 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 15 | 155 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |