MD HB984 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the employment policy of the State to provide fair employment practices to all citizens; prohibiting a person from failing or refusing to hire, or discharging a person because of the person's refusal to answer specified questions; prohibiting a person from requesting or requiring specified information from an applicant for employment on an employment application; etc.
Title
Employment - Applications for Employment - Prohibitions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations Withdrawn | |
2010-02-26 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing 3/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-12 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0984.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0984f.pdf |