MD HB983 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the number of certain bargaining units for the purpose of specifying certain pay rates for certain employees of the Maryland Department of Health; and requiring that the pay rates of certain Department employees who are in certain bargaining units and who work at certain facilities be equal to certain pay rates of the employees who work at Clifton T. Perkins Hospital.
Title
State Personnel - Maryland Department of Health - Pay Rates
Sponsors
Del. Pam Guzzone [D] | Del. Robbyn Lewis [D] | Del. Ashanti Martinez [D] | Del. Jennifer White Holland [D] |
Del. Jamila Woods [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 106 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 37 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (106-31) |
2024-04-08 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (37-7) |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {573929/1 Adopted |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (101-32) |
2024-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {923023/1 Adopted |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2024-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m. |
2024-03-05 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-09 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m. |
2024-02-05 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB1080 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-05 - Passed Enrolled
Subjects
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Public Health
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Unions
Work, Labor, and Employment
Health, Department of
Public Health
Salaries and Compensation
State Employees
State Government - Personnel
Unions
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Personnel and Pensions | 8 | 203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |