MD HB974 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 568
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 568
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the alcoholic beverages licenses for which the Board of License Commissioners for Prince George's County may issue a Sunday off-sale permit; authorizing the Board to issue a Sunday off-sale permit to the holder of any Class A alcoholic beverages license, or to the holder of any Class B alcoholic beverages license with an off-sale privilege; altering a certain reinvestment requirement for an applicant for a Sunday off-sale permit; requiring the Board, by January 1, 2023, to conduct a study of Sunday off-sale permits; etc.
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Sanctions and Sunday Off-Sale Permits PG 317-21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 568 |
2021-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2021-04-10 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Floor Amendment {734833/1 (Senator Patterson) Adopted |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-1) |
2021-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {743398/1 Adopted |
2021-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2021-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-02-05 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {564833/1 Adopted |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Blue Laws
Crimes and Punishments
Examinations
Fees
Fines
Investigations and Inquiries
License Commissioners, Boards of
Penalties and Sentences
Prince George's County
Reports
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Distribution
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Blue Laws
Crimes and Punishments
Examinations
Fees
Fines
Investigations and Inquiries
License Commissioners, Boards of
Penalties and Sentences
Prince George's County
Reports
Retail Sales
Rules and Regulations
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Alcoholic Beverages | 26 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 26 | 1104 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 26 | 1408 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 26 | 1801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 26 | 1806 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 26 | 2102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 26 | 2801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 26 | 2801.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 4 | 109 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 4 | 407 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 6 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Alcoholic Beverages | 6 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |