MD HB97 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-07 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-07 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that any unpaid court fees or costs are not a bar to a certain expungement; requiring a court to waive any court fees and costs associated with the charge being expunged when ordering or effecting a certain expungement; adding malicious destruction of property to the list of misdemeanor convictions that may be expunged; and altering the waiting periods applicable to the filing of petitions for expungement of convictions of certain crimes.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Records (REDEEM Act of 2023)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 99 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - Floor Amendment 233223/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (Y: 38 N: 94 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2023-04-06 - House - Floor Amendment 233223/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (Y: 38 N: 94 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-07 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2023-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (99-38) |
2023-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2023-04-06 | House | Floor Amendment {233223/1 (Delegate Buckel) Rejected (38-94) |
2023-04-05 | House | Motion Special Order until 4/6 (Delegate Buckel) Adopted |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {223525/1 Adopted |
2023-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2023-01-30 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-30 | House | Hearing canceled |
2023-01-17 | House | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2023-01-11 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2022-11-17 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB37 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 683
Subjects
Court Costs
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedures
Domestic Violence
Expungement
Fees
Penalties and Sentences
Property Damage
Records
Time
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Procedures
Domestic Violence
Expungement
Fees
Penalties and Sentences
Property Damage
Records
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Procedure | 10 | 105.4 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Criminal Procedure | 10 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |