MD HB966 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 393
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the information shown in the budget of the College of Southern Maryland; and requiring certain county commissioners to review and approve a budget request made by the College of Southern Maryland.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education - College of Southern Maryland - Budget

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 393
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2020-03-15SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2020-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (132-0)
2020-03-13HouseFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2020-03-13HouseFavorable Report by Appropriations
2020-02-10HouseHearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-02-05HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education16610(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback