MD HB966 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of the Environment, in determining whether to restrict or lift any restrictions on an area for the catching or storing of shellfish, to use the most reliable available tests to determine whether a shellfish production area poses a risk to consumer health and to rule out contaminants that do not pose a risk to consumer health, including bacteria from vegetation; and requiring the Department on or before December 31, 2011, to reconsider the designation of restricted waters.
Title
Natural Resources - Restricted Waters for Shellfish Harvesting - Testing
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | |
2011-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-23 | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-23 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-01 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-20 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | |
2011-03-18 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-18 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-17 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-02-11 | Hearing 3/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-11 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Aquaculture
Clams
Environment, Department of
Examinations
Fish and Fishing
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Oysters
Pollution
Storage
Water
Clams
Environment, Department of
Examinations
Fish and Fishing
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Health
Oysters
Pollution
Storage
Water