MD HB964 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an employer from requesting or requiring that an employee or applicant disclose any user name, password, or other means for accessing a personal account or service through specified electronic communications devices; prohibiting an employer from taking, or threatening to take, specified disciplinary actions for an employee's refusal to disclose specified password and related information; prohibiting an employee from downloading specified information or data; etc.
Title
Labor and Employment - User Name and Password Privacy Protection and Exclusions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 129 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2012-03-31 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-31 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-06 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2012-04-05 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-04-05 | Re-referred Finance | |
2012-03-27 | First Reading Senate Rules | |
2012-04-03 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Third Reading Passed (129-8) | |
2012-03-26 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments 843196/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-02-15 | Hearing 3/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-10 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Disclosure
Discrimination
Investigations and Inquiries
Privacy
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor and Employment
Discrimination
Investigations and Inquiries
Privacy
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Work, Labor and Employment