MD HB961 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-14 - First Reading Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-14 - First Reading Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the membership of a hearing board under the State Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights to require that at least one member be of the same rank as the correctional officer against whom the complaint is filed.
Title
State Correctional Officers' Bill of Rights - Hearing Board - Membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-14 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2014-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-11 | House | Special Order until 3/12 (Delegate Barnes) Adopted |
2014-03-11 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-10 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2014-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-06 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Correctional Officers
Discipline
Hearings
Public Safety
Work, Labor and Employment
Correctional Officers
Discipline
Hearings
Public Safety
Work, Labor and Employment