MD HB960 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City from transferring a license to another person until the resolution of pending criminal charges filed against the transferor that directly relates to the operation of the licensed premises or disciplinary matters before the Board concerning the transferor; authorizing the Board to grant an extension that extends the life of a license beyond a certain period of time under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Prohibited Transfers

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-19SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {743195/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-02-08HouseHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback