MD HB960 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 707
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 707
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City from transferring a license to another person until the resolution of pending criminal charges filed against the transferor that directly relates to the operation of the licensed premises or disciplinary matters before the Board concerning the transferor; authorizing the Board to grant an extension that extends the life of a license beyond a certain period of time under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Baltimore City – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Prohibited Transfers
Sponsors
Del. Nick Mosby [D] | Del. Frank Conaway [D] | Del. Cheryl Glenn [D] | Del. Keith Haynes [D] |
Del. Julian Ivey [D] | Del. Jazz Lewis [D] | Del. David Moon [D] | Del. Stephanie Smith [D] |
Sen. Alonzo Washington [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 707 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {743195/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Crimes and Punishments
Discipline
License Commissioners, Boards of
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Baltimore City
Crimes and Punishments
Discipline
License Commissioners, Boards of